+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On July 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On April 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2018
- Second Reading
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John F. Curran
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018
- Do Pass Executive; 009-000-000
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. William E. Brady
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 720 ILCS 5/1-1 - from Ch. 38, par. 1-1
+ − Vote
February 28, 2018: SB2787 - Executive
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor