+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (76)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1173
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 007-002-001
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Correctional Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Pension Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 State Debt Impact Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Home Rule Note Filed as Amended
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-007-002
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - December 3, 2014
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Antonio Muñoz
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 014-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 052-002-001
- Passed Both Houses
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Antonio Muñoz
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Balanced Budget Note Filed
- Correctional Note Filed
- Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed
- Fiscal Note Filed
- Judicial Note Filed
- Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
- Home Rule Note Filed
- Pension Note Filed
- State Debt Impact Note Filed
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr.
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-004-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 30, 2014
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 23, 2014
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 010-000-000
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Link
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 19, 2014
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Link
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 007-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 5, 2014
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 25, 2014
- Do Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 008-000-000
- Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Creates the Transportation Network Providers Act. Requires transportation network companies and participating drivers to maintain transportation network company insurance. Provides for driver requirements. Requires transportation network companies to adopt a non-discrimination policy towards passengers. Provides for both safety and operational requirements. Amends the Ridesharing Arrangements Act to make conformity changes.
Senate Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause with the bill as amended by Senate Amendment No. 1 with the following changes: adds the Director of Revenue or his or her designee as a member of the task force; requires that the task force submit its report to the Secretary of Financial and Professional Regulation, the Governor, the Speaker of the House of Representatives, and the President of the Senate by no later than December 1, 2015 (rather than December 1, 2014); and provides for the repeal of the provisions on July 1, 2016. Effective immediately.
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Public Accounting Act. Provides that the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation shall convene a task force in order to prepare a report that determines the appropriate scope of a program for regulating commercial tax return preparers, addresses the appropriate qualifications for commercial tax return preparers, and considers any other matters the task force determines to be necessary or appropriate. Further provides that the task force shall consist of 7 members, one of whom shall be appointed by the Department and be a representative of the Department; one of whom shall be appointed by the Department and be a representative of a statewide association representing CPAs; one of whom shall be appointed by the Department and be an enrolled agent or representative of the tax return preparation industry; one of whom shall be appointed by the majority caucus leader of the House of Representatives; one of whom shall be appointed by the majority caucus leader of the Senate; one of whom shall be appointed by the minority caucus leader of the House of Representatives; and one of whom shall be appointed by the minority caucus leader of the Senate. Requires that the report be submitted by no later than December 1, 2014 to the Secretary of Financial and Professional Regulation, the Governor, the Speaker of the House of Representatives, and the President of the Senate. Further provides that members of the task force shall receive no compensation, but shall be reimbursed for expenses necessarily incurred in the performance of their duties. Effective immediately.
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 225 ILCS 450/30.9 new -
- 225 ILCS 450/30.9 -
- New Act -
- 625 ILCS 30/2 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 902