+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (65)
On August 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-1003
- Effective Date August 23, 2004
- Governor Approved
On June 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 056-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Health & Human Services; 006-000-000
On May 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Health & Human Services
On May 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Edward D. Maloney
On May 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 02-May 19, 2004.
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 02
On May 18, 2004 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40(a)
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 118-000-000
On May 17, 2004 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On May 14, 2004 in the House:
- Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 31, 2004
On May 12, 2004 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kevin Joyce
On May 6, 2004 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kevin Joyce
On April 29, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Aging Committee; 009-000-000
On April 28, 2004 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On April 2, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Aging Committee
On March 29, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On March 26, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On March 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Adopted; Maloney
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
On March 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Be Approved for Consideration Health & Human Services; 010-000-000
On March 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Rules Refers to Health & Human Services
On March 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Edward D. Maloney
On February 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Rules
On February 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 2, 2004
- Second Reading
On February 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 26, 2004
- Do Pass as Amended Health & Human Services; 009-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 4 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
On February 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Health & Human Services
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Edward D. Maloney
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 4 Rules Refers to Health & Human Services
On February 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Edward D. Maloney
On February 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Health & Human Services
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Health & Human Services
On February 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Health & Human Services
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Edward D. Maloney
On February 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Edward D. Maloney
On February 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Health & Human Services
On February 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Edward D. Maloney
+ − Adopted Amendments (7)
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2
Deletes everything after the enacting clause and reinserts the provisions of Senate Bill 2768 amending the Assisted Living and Shared Housing Act in connection with vaccinations. Eliminates the bill's amendatory changes to the Hospital Licensing Act. Effective immediately.
Senate Committee Amendment No. 4
In provisions concerning flu shots for residents of assisted living or shared housing establishments, changes a reference to a resident's "medical record" to "medication record".
Senate Floor Amendment No. 5
In provisions concerning pneumonia shots for residents of assisted living or shared housing establishments, changes a reference to a resident's "medical record" to "medication record".
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (3)
May 26, 2004: HFA0002 - Concurrence - Wednesday, May 26, 2004
May 18, 2004: SB2768 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 18, 2004
March 25, 2004: SB2768 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 25, 2004
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor