+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On August 6, 2004 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0879
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2005
On June 9, 2004 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 11, 2004 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
On April 29, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 28, 2004 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Registration and Regulation Committee; 016-000-000
On April 2, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Registration and Regulation Committee
On March 29, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On March 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2004
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Sullivan, J.
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Adopted Licensed Activities; 009-000-000
On March 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Licensed Activities
On March 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John M. Sullivan
On February 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2004
- Do Pass Licensed Activities; 007-000-000
On February 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Licensed Activities
On February 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John M. Sullivan
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Restores the provisions concerning scholarships for pursuing a hospital-based diploma in nursing. Removes a provision giving priority in awarding scholarships to students in areas of the State identified as designated shortage areas that have the greatest need for nurses. Defines "nursing employment obligation" to include employment in this State as a nurse educator in the case of a graduate degree in nursing program recipient.
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- 110 ILCS 975/2 - from Ch. 144, par. 2752
- 110 ILCS 975/3 - from Ch. 144, par. 2753
- 110 ILCS 975/5 - from Ch. 144, par. 2755
- 110 ILCS 975/6 - from Ch. 144, par. 2756
- 110 ILCS 975/7 - from Ch. 144, par. 2757
+ − Votes (2)
May 11, 2004: SB2756 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 11, 2004
March 25, 2004: SB2756 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 25, 2004
+ − Sponsors (39)
Type:
Primary Sponsor