+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On February 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Rules
On February 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- To Subcommittee
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Mattie Hunter
On February 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
On February 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Health & Human Services
On February 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor