+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (50)
On August 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0855
- Effective Date August 19, 2016
- Governor Approved
On June 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Concurs
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 059-000-000
On May 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Revenue; 011-000-000
On May 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 29, 2016
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Melinda Bush
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Revenue
On May 26, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 18, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote
- Remains in Revenue & Finance Committee
- Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 005-000-000
On May 16, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
On May 13, 2016 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2016
On May 12, 2016 in the House:
- To Sales and Other Taxes Subcommittee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
On May 9, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On April 22, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Arrived in House
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Third Reading - Passed; 052-001-001
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Bush
- Recalled to Second Reading
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 012-000-000
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8 (b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2016
- Second Reading
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2016
- Do Pass Revenue; 010-000-000
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Revenue
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
House Amendment 001
Removes provisions from the engrossed bill providing that the exemption for menstrual pads, tampons, and menstrual cups is exempt from the Acts' automatic sunset provisions.
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with changes. Provides that the exemption applies only to menstrual pads, tampons, and menstrual cups (in the introduced bill, the exemption applies to additional feminine hygiene products and incontinence products). Effective immediately.
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Votes (8)
May 31, 2016: HCA0001 - Concurrence
May 30, 2016: HCA0001 - Revenue
May 26, 2016: SB2746 - Third Reading
May 18, 2016: SB2746 - Revenue & Finance
May 18, 2016: SB2746 - Sales and Other Taxes Subcommittee
April 21, 2016: SB2746 - Third Reading
April 20, 2016: SFA0001 - Revenue
March 9, 2016: SB2746 - Revenue
+ − Sponsors (52)
Type:
Primary Sponsor