+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (69)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 94-1113
- Effective Date January 1, 2008
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 054-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Judiciary; 009-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Kwame Raoul
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 03
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 03
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 013-000-000
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Withdrawn by Rep. Constance A. Howard
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40(a)
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Constance A. Howard
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Kwame Raoul
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kwame Raoul
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 012-001-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Constance A. Howard
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Constance A. Howard
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Constance A. Howard
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 9, 2007
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- Rules Refers to 2nd Reading
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 5, 2006
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 30, 2006
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 13, 2006
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 016-000-000
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 7, 2006
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 008-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 2, 2006
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Maloney
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Edward D. Maloney
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 16, 2006
- Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 006-003-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Edward D. Maloney
- Held in Judiciary
- Assigned to Judiciary
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Edward D. Maloney
+ − Adopted Amendments (5)
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that when forensic DNA testing is requested, and the testing is to be performed on or after the effective date of this amendatory Act, the forensic DNA testing shall be performed by an American Society of Crime Laboratory Directors/Laboratory Accreditation Board (ASCLD) accredited laboratory or an International Standards Organization (ISO) accredited laboratory.
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2
Provides that when forensic DNA testing is requested, and the testing is to be performed on or after the effective date of this amendatory Act of the 94th General Assembly, the forensic DNA testing shall be performed by an American Society of Crime Laboratory Directors/Laboratory Accreditation Board (ASCLD/LAB) accredited laboratory or an International Organization for Standardization (ISO) accredited laboratory, unless upon written motion and after hearing arguments or evidence, or both, the court may order the DNA testing be performed by a laboratory that is not ASCLD/LAB or ISO accredited.