+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (36)
On August 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0904
- Effective Date August 10, 2004
- Governor Approved
On June 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 13, 2004 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 13, 2004 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 097-006-012
On May 13, 2004 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Emil Jones, Jr.
On April 29, 2004 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On April 22, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary and Secondary Education Committee; 017-000-000
On April 2, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary and Secondary Education Committee
On March 29, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On March 26, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On March 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Shadid
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 26, 2004
- Third Reading - Passed; 042-013-000
On March 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Adopted Executive; 011-001-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. George P. Shadid
On February 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 2, 2004
- Second Reading
On February 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Education
- Do Pass as Amended Education; 008-002-001
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 25, 2004
On February 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Vince Demuzio
On February 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On February 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Vince Demuzio
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Makes a technical correction.
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Makes a technical correction.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 13, 2004: SB2732 - Third Reading - Thursday, May 13, 2004
March 25, 2004: SB2732 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 25, 2004
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor