+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (45)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-1002
- Effective Date January 1, 2005
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 056-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Adopted Environment & Energy; 007-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Environment & Energy
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 118-000-000
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01-May 20, 2004
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Consumer Protection Committee; 008-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Consumer Protection Committee
- Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 31, 2004
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Delgado
- Fiscal Note Filed
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 010-000-000
- Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Environment & Energy; 011-000-000
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Sandoval
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2004
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Environment & Energy
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 26, 2004
- Do Pass Environment & Energy; 007-001-001
- Assigned to Environment & Energy
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Public Utilities Act. Provides that it shall be unlawful for any prepaid calling service provider to offer or provide or seek to offer or provide to any distributor, prepaid calling service reseller, prepaid calling service retailer, or end user any prepaid calling service unless the prepaid calling service provider has applied for and received a Certificate of Prepaid Calling Service Provider Authority from the Illinois Commerce Commission. Provides that the Commission may establish and implement minimum service quality standards for prepaid calling service. Amends the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Provides that it is an unlawful practice under the Act for any prepaid calling service provider or prepaid calling service reseller to sell or offer to sell prepaid calling service to any prepaid calling service retailer unless the prepaid calling service provider has applied for and received a Certificate of Prepaid Calling Service Provider Authority from the Illinois Commerce Commission and the prepaid calling service provider or prepaid calling service reseller shows proof of the prepaid calling service provider's Certificate of Prepaid Calling Service Provider Authority to the prepaid calling service retailer. Provides that it is an unlawful practice for any prepaid calling service retailer to sell or offer to sell prepaid calling service to any consumer unless the prepaid calling service retailer retains proof of certification of the prepaid calling service provider by the Illinois Commerce Commission. Requires that specified disclosures be made for a prepaid calling service provider or prepaid calling service to sell or offer to sell prepaid calling service.
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Public Utilities Act. Provides that it shall be unlawful for any prepaid calling service provider to offer or provide or seek to offer or provide to any distributor, prepaid calling service reseller, prepaid calling service retailer, or end user any prepaid calling service unless the prepaid calling service provider has applied for and received a Certificate of Prepaid Calling Service Provider Authority from the Illinois Commerce Commission. Provides that the Commission may establish and implement minimum service quality standards for prepaid calling service. Amends the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Provides that it is an unlawful practice under the Act for any prepaid calling service provider or prepaid calling service reseller to sell or offer to sell prepaid calling service to any prepaid calling service retailer unless the prepaid calling service provider has applied for and received a Certificate of Prepaid Calling Service Provider Authority from the Illinois Commerce Commission and the prepaid calling service provider or prepaid calling service reseller shows proof of the prepaid calling service provider's Certificate of Prepaid Calling Service Provider Authority to the prepaid calling service retailer. Provides that it is an unlawful practice for any prepaid calling service retailer to sell or offer to sell prepaid calling service to any consumer unless the prepaid calling service retailer retains proof of certification of the prepaid calling service provider by the Illinois Commerce Commission. Requires that specified disclosures be made for a prepaid calling service provider or prepaid calling service to sell or offer to sell prepaid calling service.
+ − Statute Amended
- 220 ILCS 5/13-403 - from Ch. 111 2/3, par. 13-403