+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On January 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As January 13, 2021
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading January 10, 2021
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
On January 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
On July 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 12, 2019
- Do Pass Appropriations II; 010-000-005
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-assigned to Appropriations II
- Re-referred to Assignments
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
+ − Vote
March 7, 2019: SB0271 - Appropriations II
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor