+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (41)
On August 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1073
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2019
On June 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 30, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On May 25, 2018 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
On May 24, 2018 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 009-000-000
On May 14, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Tracy
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
On May 10, 2018 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On May 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Labor; 014-000-000
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2018
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Labor
On April 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy
On April 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Labor
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Jil Tracy
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2018
- Second Reading
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018
- Do Pass Executive; 009-000-000
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. William E. Brady
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 25 ILCS 130/2-1 - from Ch. 63, par. 1002-1
- 20 ILCS 415/11 - from Ch. 127, par. 63b111