+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On July 21, 2004 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0786
- Effective Date July 21, 2004
- Governor Approved
On June 9, 2004 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 11, 2004 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-013-001
On April 29, 2004 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On April 27, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 21, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Financial Institutions Committee; 015-000-000
On April 2, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Financial Institutions Committee
On March 29, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On March 26, 2004 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
On March 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
On March 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2004
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Lightford
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Adopted Financial Institutions; 008-000-000
On March 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Financial Institutions
On March 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
On February 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2004
- Do Pass Financial Institutions; 009-000-000
On February 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Financial Institutions
On February 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Requires the Commissioner of Banks and Real Estate to work with the Director of Aging to encourage (instead of "ensure that") financial institutions regulated by the Department of Banks and Real Estate participate in the Department on Aging's financial exploitation of the elderly intervention program.
+ − Statute Amended
- 20 ILCS 3205/6 - from Ch. 17, par. 456
+ − Votes (2)
May 11, 2004: SB2707 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 11, 2004
March 25, 2004: SB2707 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 25, 2004
+ − Sponsors (46)
Type:
Primary Sponsor