+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0703
- Effective Date June 25, 2012
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 018-000-000
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 29, 2012
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 18, 2012
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Haine
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 010-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William R. Haine
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2012
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 26, 2012
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 23, 2012
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2012
- Do Pass Executive; 012-000-000
- Assigned to Executive
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the School Code. Provides that after July 1, 2015, each educational service region must contain at least 61,000 (instead of 43,000) inhabitants. Provides that before June 30, 2013, regions may be consolidated voluntarily or by joint resolution of the county boards of regions seeking to join a voluntary consolidation, effective July 1, 2015, to meet these population requirements. Provides that the boundaries of regions already meeting these population requirements on the effective date of the amendatory Act may not be changed except to consolidate with another region or a whole county portion of another region that does not meet these population requirements. Provides that if, before January 1, 2014, locally determined consolidation decisions result in more than 35 regions of population greater than 61,000 each (instead of 45 regions of population greater than 43,000 each), the State Board of Education, before June 1, 2014, shall direct further consolidation, beginning with the region of lowest population, until the number of 35 (instead of 45) regions is achieved. Removes a provision that requires, if any region does not meet the population requirements, the State Board, within 15 days, to direct such consolidation of that region with another region or regions to which it is contiguous as will result in a region conforming to the population requirements. Provides that if, within 90 days after the most recent certified federal census, a region does not meet the population requirements, then regions may be consolidated voluntarily under specified provisions of the School Code or by joint resolution of the county boards of regions seeking to join a voluntary consolidation to meet the population requirements. Provides that if locally determined consolidation decisions result in a region not meeting the population requirements or result in more than 35 regions, then the State Board shall have the authority to impose further consolidation by order of the State Superintendent of Education, with the order being a final order subject to the Administrative Review Law. Effective immediately.
+ − Statute Amended
- 105 ILCS 5/27-2 - from Ch. 122, par. 27-2