+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 19, 2013
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive
- Postponed - Executive
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Back To Executive; 003-000-000
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- To Subcommittee on Governmental Operations
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On January 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor