+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (49)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0996
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date October 3, 2008
- Sent to the Governor
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to State Government and Veterans Affairs
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01-July 10 ,2008
- Approved for Consideration Rules
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government and Veterans Affairs; 008-000-000
- 3/5 Vote Required
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 042-000-000
- Passed Both Houses
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Deanna Demuzio
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01-May 31, 2008
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
- Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Sandra M. Pihos
- Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Michael K. Smith
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 018-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2008
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 23, 2008
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 011-000-000
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Deanna Demuzio
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Demuzio
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Education
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Deanna Demuzio
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 2, 2008
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 1, 2008
- Do Pass Executive; 008-005-000
- Assigned to Executive
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, Jr.
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the School Code. With respect to the Illinois Teaching Excellence Program, makes changes concerning the $3,000 annual payment to teachers and school counselors, the $1,000 and $3,000 annual incentives for certain teachers who agree to provide mentoring (including changing the $3,000 annual incentive to $2,000 and allowing the incentives for school counselors), additional annual incentives and monetary support, funds for an electronic system to process Master Certificates and various payments and for candidate support and recruitment, and the information a regional superintendent of schools must provide to individuals seeking to register or renew a certificate. Makes changes concerning membership on the Illinois P-20 Council, including adding the President of the Illinois Adult and Continuing Educators Association or his or her designee as a member. Effective June 1, 2008.
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the School Code. With respect to the Illinois Teaching Excellence Program, makes changes concerning the $3,000 annual payment to teachers and school counselors, the $1,000 and $3,000 annual incentives for certain teachers who agree to provide mentoring (including changing the $3,000 annual incentive to $2,000 and allowing the incentives for school counselors), additional annual incentives and monetary support, funds for an electronic system to process Master Certificates and various payments and for candidate support and recruitment, and the information a regional superintendent of schools must provide to individuals seeking to register or renew a certificate. Makes changes concerning membership on the Illinois P-20 Council, including adding the President of the Illinois Adult and Continuing Educators Association or his or her designee as a member. Effective June 1, 2008.