+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (36)
On January 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On July 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
On May 30, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01-May 31, 2008
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01
On May 30, 2008 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
On May 28, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 23, 2008 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2008
On May 21, 2008 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 017-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
On May 12, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
On April 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
On April 8, 2008 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On April 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 8, 2008
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Frerichs
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Michael W. Frerichs
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 009-000-000
On April 2, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Frerichs
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Education
On April 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 2, 2008
- Second Reading
On March 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 1, 2008
- Do Pass Executive; 008-005-000
On March 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, Jr.
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the School Code. Allows school boards to award high school diplomas to honorably discharged veterans who served in the armed forces of the United States during the Vietnam Conflict. Effective immediately.
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the School Code. Allows school boards to award high school diplomas to honorably discharged veterans who served in the armed forces of the United States during the Vietnam Conflict. Effective immediately.
+ − Statute Amended
- 105 ILCS 5/2-3.64 - from Ch. 122, par. 2-3.64
+ − Votes (2)
May 30, 2008: SB2682 - Third Reading - Friday, May 30, 2008
April 8, 2008: SB2682 - Third Reading - Tuesday, April 08, 2008
+ − Sponsors (61)
Type:
Primary Sponsor