+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On January 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On July 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
On May 31, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As January 13, 2009
On April 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2008
On April 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 2, 2008
- Second Reading
On March 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 1, 2008
- Do Pass Executive; 008-005-000
On March 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, Jr.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor