+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (48)
On June 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0041
- Effective Date June 25, 2021
- Governor Approved
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 116-000-000
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Second Reading - Consent Calendar
On May 21, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
On May 20, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass / Consent Calendar Public Utilities Committee; 022-000-000
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 28, 2021
- Assigned to Public Utilities Committee
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On May 10, 2021 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jay Hoffman
On May 7, 2021 in the House:
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
- Arrived in House
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Withdrawn by Sen. Scott M. Bennett
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Energy and Public Utilities; 015-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Withdrawn by Sen. Scott M. Bennett
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Rose
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Energy and Public Utilities
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2021
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Chapin Rose
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2021
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Energy and Public Utilities; 016-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Energy and Public Utilities; 016-000-000
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Scott M. Bennett
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Energy and Public Utilities
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Energy and Public Utilities
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 13, 2021
- Second Reading
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021
- Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 003
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Public Water District Act. Provides that specified areas in Champaign County are annexed into the territory of the Sangamon Valley Public Water District on the effective date of the amendatory Act. Contains legislative findings. Effective immediately.
+ − Proposed Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 5 ILCS 70/1 - from Ch. 1, par. 1001
- 70 ILCS 3705/28.2 new -