+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Celina Villanueva
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Celina Villanueva
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 105 ILCS 5/2-3.62 - from Ch. 122, par. 2-3.62
- 105 ILCS 5/27-9.1 - from Ch. 122, par. 27-9.1
- 105 ILCS 5/27-9.2 - from Ch. 122, par. 27-9.2
- 105 ILCS 110/3 -
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor