+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On August 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0928
- Effective Date January 1, 2005
- Governor Approved
On June 16, 2004 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 18, 2004 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-001-000
On May 12, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 6, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 012-000-000
On May 4, 2004 in the House:
- Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On April 30, 2004 in the House:
- Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b); May 31, 2004
On April 20, 2004 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Arthur L. Turner
On March 30, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On March 26, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On March 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
On March 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2004
- Second Reading
On February 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2004
- Do Pass Judiciary; 008-000-000
On February 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On February 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
+ − Statute Amended
- 730 ILCS 5/3-6-2 - from Ch. 38, par. 1003-6-2