+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On August 12, 2003 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0520
- Filed Without Signature
- Effective Date August 6, 2003; Presented to the Governor on 6-6-03.
On June 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 8, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 118-000-000
On May 1, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 10, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 011-000-000
On March 31, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On March 26, 2003 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On March 26, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
On March 26, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 25, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 26, 2003
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; del Valle
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Judiciary; 010-000-000
On March 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary
On March 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary
On February 28, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Miguel del Valle
On February 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 26, 2003
- Do Pass Judiciary; 010-000-000
On February 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On February 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Miguel del Valle
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Provides that the theft of property exceeding $500,000 in value and the laundering of criminally derived property of a value exceeding $500,000 is a Class 1 non-probationable felony (rather than a Class X felony). In the provisions concerning money laundering, deletes from the new definition of "criminally derived property" "expressly or impliedly".
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 720 ILCS 5/16-1 - from Ch. 38, par. 16-1
- 720 ILCS 5/29B-1 - from Ch. 38, par. 29B-1