+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Judiciary
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Judiciary
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Judiciary
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Judiciary
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Judiciary
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Judiciary
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On December 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor