+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On July 30, 2004 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0850
- Effective Date July 30, 2004
- Governor Approved
On June 9, 2004 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 11, 2004 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
On April 29, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 28, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 012-000-000
On April 20, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Insurance Committee
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On March 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
On March 2, 2004 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
On February 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 2, 2004
- Second Reading
On February 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 25, 2004
- Do Pass as Amended Insurance & Pensions; 008-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance & Pensions
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
On February 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- Held in Insurance & Pensions
On February 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Insurance & Pensions
On February 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
In provisions prohibiting life insurance companies from refusing to insure, continuing to insure, limiting the amount or extent or kind of coverage available to an individual, or charging an individual a different rate for the same coverage for reasons associated with an applicant's or insured's past lawful travel experiences, inserts language indicating that the applicant's or insured's travel is the sole reason for the company's refusal to provide coverage, change coverage, or change in rate charged.
+ − Statute Amended
- 215 ILCS 5/236 - from Ch. 73, par. 848
+ − Votes (2)
May 11, 2004: SB2620 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 11, 2004
March 2, 2004: SB2620 - Third Reading - Tuesday, March 02, 2004
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor