+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On August 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
On February 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2004
- Do Pass Licensed Activities; 009-000-000
On February 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Licensed Activities
On February 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine
+ − Statute Amended
- 225 ILCS 60/40 - from Ch. 111, par. 4400-40