+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (67)
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton
- Third Reading - Standard Debate - Lost 045-037-011
- 3/5 Vote Required
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 5 Adopted
- Recalled to Second Reading - Standard Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 5 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis
- House Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Rules Committee
- Third Reading - Consideration Postponed
- Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Removed from Short Debate Status
- Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed
- Third Reading - Consideration Postponed
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 007-004-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis
- Home Rule Note Filed
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Home Rule Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 007-001-001
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. William Davis
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 1, 2018
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Clayborne
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Clayborne
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 014-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
- Do Pass Transportation; 011-000-000
- Assigned to Transportation
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
+ − Adopted Amendments (6)
House Amendment 005
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the engrossed bill, as amended by House Amendments No. 2, 3, and 4. Provides that the amendatory Act does not apply to any municipality, county, or road district that has established a disadvantaged business enterprise program prior to the effective date of the amendatory Act. Effective immediately.
House Amendment 004
Makes a technical correction to remove an extra effective date Section.
House Amendment 003
Adds provisions to the engrossed bill providing that a municipality, county, or road district that is required to implement a disadvantaged business enterprise program under the terms of the amendatory Act may adopt processes requiring disadvantaged business enterprises and non-disadvantaged business enterprises to provide additional documentation and assurances that the enterprise is qualified to complete the necessary work of the contract. Provides that no such municipality, county, or road district may adopt separate standards for disadvantaged business enterprises and non-disadvantaged business enterprises. Provides that the additional processes must conform with federal regulations. Provides that, if a disadvantaged business enterprise bid price is more than 5% above the non-disadvantaged business enterprise bid price, the municipality, county, or road district may grant a goal modification if it determines that good faith efforts have been met on the part of the prime contractor to meet the disadvantaged business enterprise contract goals.
House Amendment 002
Adds provisions to the engrossed bill providing that the Department of Transportation shall publish and continuously maintain (in the engrossed bill, publish only) on its website all relevant data in its possession for establishing regional goals for affected municipalities, counties, and road districts to implement business enterprise programs. Provides that the Department of Revenue shall prepare, publish on its website, and maintain a continuous list of all affected municipalities, counties, and road districts receiving more than $1,500,000 in motor fuel tax revenue in the previous fiscal year. Provides that no municipality, county, or road district that received distributions totaling more than $2,000,000 (in the engrossed bill, $1,000,000) in any State fiscal year beginning on or after July 1, 2018 shall receive any motor fuel tax distributions on or after July 1 of the third fiscal year to occur after the fiscal year in which the municipality, county, or road district received distributions totaling more than $2,000,000 unless, on or before June 30 of the second fiscal year after the municipality, county, or road district received distributions totaling more than $2,000,000, that municipality, county, or road district implements a business enterprise program. Adds a severability clause.
Senate Amendment 002
In provisions of the Department of Transportation Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois concerning business enterprise program data, provides that the Department of Transportation is not responsible (rather than responsible or liable) in any way for the implementation of a local business enterprise program.
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill, but removes provisions requiring the Department of Transportation to assist municipalities, counties, and road districts in implementing business enterprise programs. Provides that the Department of Transportation shall publish on its website all relevant data in its possession for establishing regional goals for municipalities, counties, and road districts to implement business enterprise programs. Provides that the posting shall include certain studies and data. Provides that the posting is intended as a public resource for affected municipalities, counties, and road districts, but the Department is not responsible or liable for the implementation of a local business enterprise program. Effective immediately.
+ − Proposed Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 20 ILCS 2705/2705-615 new -
- 35 ILCS 505/8 - from Ch. 120, par. 424