+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 22, 2016
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Licensed Activities and Pensions
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor