+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (55)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0979
- Effective Date August 20, 2004
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 055-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 055-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Judiciary; 009-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Judiciary; 009-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Kirk W. Dillard
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Kirk W. Dillard
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01,02-May 19, 2004.
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01,02
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 118-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
- Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 31, 2004
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Delgado
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 013-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. William Delgado
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 26, 2004
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2004
- Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 007-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kirk W. Dillard
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kirk W. Dillard
- Postponed - Judiciary
- Assigned to Judiciary
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kirk W. Dillard
+ − Adopted Amendments (4)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes all. Reinserts the provisions of Senate Amendment No. 2. Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. In the amendatory provisions to the Sex Offender Registration Act, eliminates provision that initial and updated registration information must highlighted on the Department of State Police Sex Offender Database for a period of 90 days. Provides that address verification of sex offenders must be made at least once per year (rather than once per calendar year). In the amendatory provisions to the Sex Offender and Child Murderer Community Notification Law, eliminates provision that the Department of State Police must provide on its Web page hyperlinks to the sex offender Web sites of Missouri, Indiana, Wisconsin, Kentucky, and Iowa and must highlight additions to its registry for a period of 90 days. Eliminates provision that the Department of State Police may limit access to the sex offender information to information about sex offenders who reside within a specified geographic area in proximity to the address of the person seeking the information. Provides that the Department of State Police, Sex Offender Registration Unit, must develop and conduct training to educate all of those entities involved in the Sex Offender Registration Program. Effective immediately.
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes all. Reinserts the provisions of Senate Amendment No. 2. Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. In the amendatory provisions to the Sex Offender Registration Act, eliminates provision that initial and updated registration information must highlighted on the Department of State Police Sex Offender Database for a period of 90 days. Provides that address verification of sex offenders must be made at least once per year (rather than once per calendar year). In the amendatory provisions to the Sex Offender and Child Murderer Community Notification Law, eliminates provision that the Department of State Police must provide on its Web page hyperlinks to the sex offender Web sites of Missouri, Indiana, Wisconsin, Kentucky, and Iowa and must highlight additions to its registry for a period of 90 days. Eliminates provision that the Department of State Police may limit access to the sex offender information to information about sex offenders who reside within a specified geographic area in proximity to the address of the person seeking the information. Provides that the Department of State Police, Sex Offender Registration Unit, must develop and conduct training to educate all of those entities involved in the Sex Offender Registration Program. Effective immediately.
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2
Deletes all. Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that if a parolee or releasee fails to comply with the Sex Offender Registration Act, if applicable, the supervising parole officer shall request the Department of Corrections to issue an arrest warrant for the parolee or releasee. Amends the Sex Offender Registration Act. Provides that a sex offender or sexual predator must furnish the law enforcement agency where he or she registers with a current photograph to be updated annually. Provides that the supervising parole or probation officer shall, within 15 days of sentencing to probation or release from an Illinois Department of Corrections facility, contact the law enforcement agency in the jurisdiction in which the sex offender or sexual predator designated as his or her intended residence and verify compliance with the requirements of the Act. Provides that revocation proceedings shall be immediately commenced against a sex offender or sexual predator on probation, parole, or mandatory supervised release who fails to comply with the requirements of the Act. Provides that a violation of the Act is a Class 3 felony rather than a Class 4 felony. Amends the Sex Offender and Child Murderer Community Notification Law. Provides that the Department of State Police must provide on its Web page hyperlinks to the sex offender Web sites of Missouri, Indiana, Wisconsin, Kentucky, and Iowa. Provides that the Department of State Police must highlight additions to its registry for a period of 90 days.
+ − Statute Amended
- 730 ILCS 150/10 - from Ch. 38, par. 230