+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On January 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On March 26, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On March 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
On March 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2004
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Clayborne
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Adopted Licensed Activities; 008-000-000
On March 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Licensed Activities
On March 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
On March 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
On February 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2004
- Do Pass Licensed Activities; 009-000-000
On February 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Licensed Activities
On February 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- 50 ILCS 705/6 - from Ch. 85, par. 506
- 50 ILCS 705/6.1 -
- 50 ILCS 705/6.2 new -
- 50 ILCS 705/8.1 - from Ch. 85, par. 508.1
- 50 ILCS 705/8.2 -
+ − Vote
March 25, 2004: SB2605 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 25, 2004
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor