+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On April 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
On April 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -