+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (43)
- Total Veto Stands
- Placed Calendar Total Veto November 16, 2016
- Governor Vetoed
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 064-051-000
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2016
- Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed
- Third Reading - Consideration Postponed
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 004-001-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Remains in Revenue & Finance Committee
- Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 008-003-000
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2016
- To Sales and Other Taxes Subcommittee
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Commerce and Economic Development; 009-002-000
- Third Reading - Passed; 033-018-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Delgado
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2016
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Commerce and Economic Development
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William Delgado
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Do Pass as Amended Commerce and Economic Development; 013-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2016
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Commerce and Economic Development
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William Delgado
- Postponed - Commerce and Economic Development
- Postponed - Commerce and Economic Development
- Assigned to Commerce and Economic Development
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. William Delgado
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
Senate Amendment 002
Reinserts "woman" into the definition of a minority group. Defines "public funds" and "public monies". Provides that no membership fees, dues, or assessments shall be required of any commission member.
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill changing the following: that the board of a commission shall include at least: (i) 2 members from 2 separate minority groups, or (ii) one member who is a woman and one member from a minority group (2 members from 2 separate minority group in the introduced bill); removing "a woman" from the definition of "minority group"; and amends the Economic Development Area Tax Increment Allocation Act, the County Economic Development Project Area Property Tax Allocation Act, the County Economic Development Project Area Tax Increment Allocation Act of 1991, the Tax Increment Allocation Redevelopment Act and the Industrial Jobs Recover Law of the Illinois Municipal Code, and the Economic Development Project Area Tax Increment Allocation Act of 1995 making contributing changes.
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- 65 ILCS 110/60 -
- 20 ILCS 620/9 - from Ch. 67 1/2, par. 1009
- 55 ILCS 85/9 - from Ch. 34, par. 7009
- 55 ILCS 90/60 - from Ch. 34, par. 8060
- 65 ILCS 5/11-74.4-4 - from Ch. 24, par. 11-74.4-4
- 65 ILCS 5/11-74.6-15 -