+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On August 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0531
- Effective Date August 14, 2009
- Governor Approved
On June 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 19, 2009 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
On May 12, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 6, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
On April 20, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On April 6, 2009 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On April 3, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On April 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-001
On April 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 2, 2009
On February 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 4, 2009
- Second Reading
On February 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 25, 2009
- Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 008-000-000
On February 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs
On February 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Frerichs
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
May 19, 2009: SB0260 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 19, 2009
April 2, 2009: SB0260 - Third Reading - Thursday, April 02, 2009
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor