+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (48)
On January 3, 2017 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On November 9, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 28, 2016
On December 4, 2015 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 29, 2016
On November 10, 2015 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John Bradley
On November 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John M. Sullivan
On November 9, 2015 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John Bradley
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Public Utilities Committee
On November 6, 2015 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John Bradley
On October 30, 2015 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) December 4, 2015
On October 23, 2015 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Removed Rep. Carol Sente
On October 20, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Public Utilities Committee; 013-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Public Utilities Committee; by Voice Vote
On October 19, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John Bradley
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Public Utilities Committee
On October 14, 2015 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) October 31, 2015
- Assigned to Public Utilities Committee
On May 15, 2015 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 15, 2015
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 24, 2015
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 19, 2015
- Do Pass as Amended Local Government; 009-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Local Government
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Local Government
On January 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Prefiled with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
+ − Adopted Amendments (5)
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Local Records Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the local records advisor.
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Open Meetings Act. Recodifies a Section concerning internet posting requirements from the Local Records Act to the Open Meetings Act including and adds new language requiring all public bodies that maintain a website to additionally publish notices, agendas, records, or other information or material that is required to be published in a newspaper by law or court order to their website. Amends the local Records Act to repeal the recodified Section.
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 50 ILCS 205/20 -
- 5 ILCS 120/2.03.5 new -
- 50 ILCS 205/20 rep. -
- 50 ILCS 205/5 - from Ch. 116, par. 43.105