+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 20 ILCS 3305/25 new -
- 30 ILCS 105/5.875 new -
- 625 ILCS 5/3-806 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 3-806
- 625 ILCS 5/3-815 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 3-815
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor