+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On March 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On February 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- To Executive Subcommittee on State And Local Government
On February 10, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On January 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Brady
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 730 ILCS 5/3-3-2 - from Ch. 38, par. 1003-3-2
- 730 ILCS 5/3-8-2 - from Ch. 38, par. 1003-8-2
- 730 ILCS 5/3-8-4 - from Ch. 38, par. 1003-8-4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor