+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (62)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0854
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date August 19, 2016
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Concurs
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 059-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 059-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government and Veterans Affairs; 005-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government and Veterans Affairs; 005-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government and Veterans Affairs
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government and Veterans Affairs
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 29, 2016
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Laura M. Murphy
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Laura M. Murphy
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 005-000-000
- Remains in Revenue & Finance Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2016
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine
- To Finance Subcommittee
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; L. Murphy
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2016
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 18, 2016
- Do Pass as Amended State Government and Veterans Affairs; 007-001-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 22, 2016
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy
- Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy
+ − Adopted Amendments (4)
House Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the engrossed bill with the following change: provides that the economic and fiscal policy report is due to the General Assembly by November 15 of each year (in the engrossed bill, August 15; currently, by the 3rd business day in January).
House Amendment 001
Removes the provisions of Senate Amendment 2 providing that the economic and fiscal policy report is due to the General Assembly by August 15 of each year.
Senate Amendment 002
Provides that the economic and fiscal policy report is due to the General Assembly by August 15 of each year (instead of the third business day in January).
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Governor's Office of Management and Budget Act. Provides that the annual economic and fiscal policy report submitted to the General Assembly by the Governor's Office of Management and Budget must include economic and fiscal policy intentions for the following 4 (currently, 2) fiscal years. Provides that the report must include any assumptions concerning tax rates and fees used to determine revenue and expenditures for future fiscal years. Provides that the report must include a comparison of the enacted current fiscal year budget to the current fiscal year outlook, and must include fiscal and policy options that the Governor's Office of Management and Budget will pursue to remedy any budgetary shortfalls. Provides that the report must include an agency categorization key for the reporting categories. Effective immediately.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 20 ILCS 3005/2.4 - from Ch. 127, par. 412.4
- 20 ILCS 3005/7.3 -