+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On January 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On April 17, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On April 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
On April 16, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2008
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Althoff
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 006-000-000
On April 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue
On April 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
On March 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 1, 2008
- Do Pass as Amended Revenue; 009-000-000
On March 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- Held in Revenue
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
On March 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
On February 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Revenue
On February 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Requires that the certified list of eligible objectors also contain the owners of record who may sign an objection petition. Requires that the list be comprised of each person for whom the municipality has received a return receipt for the mailed notice (instead of each person to whom the notice was mailed).
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Requires that the certified list of eligible objectors also contain the owners of record who may sign an objection petition. Requires that the list be comprised of each person for whom the municipality has received a return receipt for the mailed notice (instead of each person to whom the notice was mailed).
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Vote
April 17, 2008: SB2584 - Third Reading - Thursday, April 17, 2008
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor