+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On March 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Transportation
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Transportation
On February 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Transportation
On February 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Transportation
On January 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Transportation
On January 11, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. M. Maggie Crotty
+ − Statute Amended
- 625 ILCS 5/1-118 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 1-118
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor