+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (47)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-1001
- Effective Date August 23, 2004
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 056-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Judiciary; 008-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 118-000-000
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01-May 19, 2004.
- Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 31, 2004
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Frank Aguilar
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 010-000-001
- Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sandra M. Pihos
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2004
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2004
- Do Pass as Amended Executive; 012-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
- Held in Executive
- Assigned to Executive
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Further amends the Illinois Notary Public Act and the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Reinserts the 10-year period during which an applicant must not have held any notary appointment that was revoked, suspended, or canceled. Provides that no notary public who is not an attorney or an accredited representative shall provide or accept payment in exchange for any assistance that requires legal analysis, legal judgment, or interpretation of the law. Makes changes to the fee limit provision. Provides that the $1,000 fine imposed for violation of the immigration services notice requirement shall apply only if the violation is not subject to penalties under the Illinois Notary Public Act. Provides that the maximum fees charged in matters concerning immigration services shall be those set forth in the Illinois Notary Public Act, rather than those established by the Attorney General. Makes other changes.
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Further amends the Illinois Notary Public Act and the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Reinserts the 10-year period during which an applicant must not have held any notary appointment that was revoked, suspended, or canceled. Provides that no notary public who is not an attorney or an accredited representative shall provide or accept payment in exchange for any assistance that requires legal analysis, legal judgment, or interpretation of the law. Makes changes to the fee limit provision. Provides that the $1,000 fine imposed for violation of the immigration services notice requirement shall apply only if the violation is not subject to penalties under the Illinois Notary Public Act. Provides that the maximum fees charged in matters concerning immigration services shall be those set forth in the Illinois Notary Public Act, rather than those established by the Attorney General. Makes other changes.
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- 5 ILCS 312/1-104 - from Ch. 102, par. 201-104
- 5 ILCS 312/2-102 - from Ch. 102, par. 202-102
- 5 ILCS 312/3-103 - from Ch. 102, par. 203-103
- 5 ILCS 312/3-104 - from Ch. 102, par. 203-104
- 815 ILCS 505/2AA -