+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 11, 2004 in the House:
- Tabled By Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios
On April 27, 2004 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On April 22, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 013-000-000
On April 2, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On March 26, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios
On March 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On March 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2004
- Second Reading
On February 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2004
- Do Pass Judiciary; 007-000-000
On February 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On February 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
+ − Statute Amended
- 730 ILCS 150/7 - from Ch. 38, par. 227
+ − Vote
March 25, 2004: SB2546 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 25, 2004
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor