+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
On July 14, 2004 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0728
- Effective Date January 1, 2005
- Governor Approved
On June 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 4, 2004 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 118-000-000
On April 27, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 21, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 009-000-000
On April 2, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee
On March 30, 2004 in the House:
- Sponsor Removed Rep. Karen May
On March 26, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. John A. Fritchey
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On March 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On March 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2004
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Martinez
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Adopted Insurance & Pensions; 010-000-000
On March 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Insurance & Pensions
On March 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
On February 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance & Pensions
- Do Pass as Amended Insurance & Pensions; 009-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 25, 2004
On February 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
On February 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Insurance & Pensions
On February 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that a person or entity that provides an insurance card must print on the card an identification number unique to the holder of the card in the format prescribed by the Uniform Prescription Drug Information Card Act.
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that a person or entity that provides an insurance card must print on the card an identification number unique to the holder of the card in the format prescribed by the Uniform Prescription Drug Information Card Act.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
May 4, 2004: SB2545 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 04, 2004
March 25, 2004: SB2545 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 25, 2004
+ − Sponsors (41)
Type:
Primary Sponsor