+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On January 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On April 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On April 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Held in Executive; Subcommittee on State Government Operations
On April 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- To Executive Subcommittee on State Government Operations
On March 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As April 26, 2012
On March 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Re-assigned to Executive
- Re-referred to Assignments
On March 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 30, 2012
On February 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- To Labor Subcommittee on Special Issues
On January 31, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Labor
On December 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kyle McCarter
+ − Statute Amended
- 820 ILCS 405/607 - from Ch. 48, par. 437
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor