+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On May 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020
On May 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020
On April 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 15, 2020
On April 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2020
On April 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 30, 2020
On April 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On March 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2020
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 2, 2020
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Judiciary
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Judiciary
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 735 ILCS 5/15-1508 - from Ch. 110, par. 15-1508
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor