+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (47)
On December 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Total Veto Stands
On November 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- 3/5 Vote Required
On November 16, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Total Veto
On November 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Override Governor Veto - Senate Passed 038-019-000
On November 16, 2016 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On November 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
- Placed Calendar Total Veto November 16, 2016
On July 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Vetoed
On May 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 18, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 068-043-001
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading - Standard Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
On May 13, 2016 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On May 12, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
- Do Pass / Standard Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 011-008-000
- Fiscal Note Filed
On May 11, 2016 in the House:
- Correctional Note Filed
On May 10, 2016 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Carol Ammons
On May 9, 2016 in the House:
- Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed
On May 6, 2016 in the House:
- Balanced Budget Note Filed
On May 3, 2016 in the House:
- State Debt Impact Note Filed
- Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed
On May 2, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
- Pension Note Filed
- Judicial Note Filed
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Arrived in House
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 036-018-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Martinez
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 006-002-000
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2016
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 7, 2016
- Do Pass Human Services; 005-001-000
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Human Services
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Human Services
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Human Services
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 001
Adds provisions requiring the Department of Human Services to provide mandatory annual trainings covering health and safety matters appropriate to a home-based setting for non-relative providers in the child care assistance program. Provides that relative providers shall be encouraged, but not required, to attend mandatory annual trainings; and that both non-relative and relative providers shall be paid $15 per hour for their attendance at such trainings. Adds provisions concerning the locations of the mandatory annual trainings, notice requirements, and online training.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (6)
November 16, 2016: SB2536 - Motion
May 18, 2016: SB2536 - Third Reading
May 12, 2016: SB2536 - Appropriations-Human Services
April 20, 2016: SB2536 - Third Reading
April 20, 2016: SFA0001 - Human Services
April 5, 2016: SB2536 - Human Services
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor