+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (64)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1040
- Effective Date January 1, 2023
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Mental Health & Addiction Committee; 016-000-000
- Assigned to Mental Health & Addiction Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
- Arrived in House
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 006-000-000
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Bush
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Bush
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Bush
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Adopted; Bush
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Third Reading - Passed; 049-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As March 11, 2022
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 008-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 008-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 008-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 5, 2022
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 21, 2021
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2021
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 007-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2021
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2021
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 22, 2021
- Do Pass Licensed Activities; 006-002-000
- Waive Posting Notice
- Re-assigned to Licensed Activities
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 23, 2021
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
- Assigned to Licensed Activities
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush
+ − Adopted Amendments (4)
Senate Amendment 005
Deletes provisions of the bill, as amended by Senate Amendment No. 2, that relate to prescriptions of opioids in hospitals or institutions licensed under the Hospital Licensing Act and requirements for providing opioid antagonists to patients who are being discharged after having overdosed on controlled substances.
Senate Amendment 004
Provides that in a hospital or institution licensed under the Hospital Licensing Act, all prescribers of an opioid shall inform the patient that opioids are addictive and that opioid antagonists are available by prescription or from a pharmacy. Provides that upon discharge, any patient who has overdosed on controlled substances shall be provided with an opioid antagonist in accordance with written, standardized procedures or protocols developed by the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation with the Department of Human Services and the Department of Public Health and filed at the pharmacy before implementation and are available to the Department of Human Services upon request. Defines "opioid antagonist".
Senate Amendment 003
Changes the effective date of the bill from January 1, 2022 to January 1, 2023.
Senate Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Pharmacy Practice Act. In a provision regarding dispensing opioid antagonists, provides that notwithstanding any general or special law to the contrary, a licensed pharmacist shall (rather than may) dispense an opioid antagonist in accordance with written, standardized procedures or protocols developed by the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation with the Department of Public Health and the Department of Human Services and filed at the pharmacy. Provides that before dispensing an opioid a pharmacist shall inform patients that opioids are addictive and offer to dispense an opioid antagonist. Deletes language concerning a training program approved by the Department of Human Services for pharmacists to complete before dispensing an opioid. Amends the Illinois Controlled Substances Act. Provides that prescribers who issue a prescription for an opioid shall inform the patient that opioids are addictive and that opioid antagonists are available by prescription or from a pharmacy. Provides that in a hospital or institution licensed under the Hospital Licensing Act, all prescribers of an opioid shall inform the patient that opioids are addictive and that opioid antagonists are available by prescription or from a pharmacy. Provides that upon discharge any patient who has overdosed on controlled substances shall be provided with an opioid antagonist. Provides that if the patient is not able to pay for the opioid antagonist, then the State of Illinois shall reimburse the hospital for the opioid antagonist from federal grant funds to address substance use disorder or other State funds for the same purpose. Adds an effective date provision of January 1, 2022.
+ − Proposed Amendments (5)
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 720 ILCS 570/322 new -
- 225 ILCS 85/19.1 -
- 720 ILCS 570/312 - from Ch. 56 1/2, par. 1312
- 720 ILCS 570/313 - from Ch. 56 1/2, par. 1313