+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On January 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On June 4, 2006 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
On March 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Extended to January 9, 2007
On February 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 14, 2006
- Second Reading
On February 8, 2006 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 9, 2006
- Do Pass Executive; 008-005-000
On February 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On January 18, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, Jr.
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor