+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (32)
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On May 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 16, 2018
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
On May 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
On May 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 8, 2018
- Do Pass as Amended State Government; 007-000-000
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
On April 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Postponed - State Government
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - State Government
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - State Government
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Postponed - State Government
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - State Government
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - State Government
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to State Government
On April 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Postponed - State Government
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - State Government
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Postponed - State Government
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Postponed - State Government
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Postponed - State Government
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (3)
May 2, 2018: SB2533 - State Government
May 2, 2018: SCA0001 - State Government
May 2, 2018: SCA0002 - State Government
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor