+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (46)
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date August 27, 2021
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0658
- Sent to the Governor
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 059-000-000
- Senate Concurs
- Passed Both Houses
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Revenue; 010-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Revenue
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 24, 2021
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Win Stoller
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 015-001-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anthony DeLuca
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- Arrived in House
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 010-000-000
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Stoller
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Revenue
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2021
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Win Stoller
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Do Pass Revenue; 009-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2021
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Win Stoller
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Assigned to Revenue
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Win Stoller
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the engrossed bill with changes. Provides that provisions concerning pass-through entities apply only with respect to taxable years for which a specified limitation on individual deductions applies under the Internal Revenue Code. Adds a corresponding addition modification. Makes a conforming change with respect to the Local Government Distributive Fund. Effective immediately.
Senate Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts provisions of the introduced bill creating an entity-level tax, but makes certain formatting changes. Provides that the entity-level tax applies for taxable years ending on or after December 31, 2021 and beginning prior to January 1, 2026. Provides that the entity-level tax shall be in an amount equal to 4.95% of the taxpayer's net income for the taxable year. Defines "net income". Provides that a partnership or Subchapter S corporation that elects to pay tax at the entity level is required to pay estimated tax if the amount payable as estimated tax can reasonably be expected to exceed $500. Effective immediately.
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with changes. Provides that the tax imposed under the introduced bill applies for taxable years beginning on or after January 1, 2021. Provides that certain nonresident individuals with no Illinois income tax liability after taking into account the deductions in the amendatory Act are not required to file returns. Makes various technical corrections concerning pass-through entities. Effective immediately.
+ − Proposed Amendments (3)
+ − Statutes Amended (7)
- 35 ILCS 5/201
- 35 ILCS 5/203 - from Ch. 120, par. 2-203
- 35 ILCS 5/601 - from Ch. 120, par. 6-601
- 35 ILCS 5/709.5
- 35 ILCS 5/1501 - from Ch. 120, par. 15-1501
- 35 ILCS 5/502 - from Ch. 120, par. 5-502
- 35 ILCS 5/901