+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On January 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On March 23, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On March 22, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On March 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
On March 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 22, 2012
- Second Reading
On February 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 9, 2012
- Do Pass Criminal Law; 008-000-000
On January 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Criminal Law
On November 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
+ − Statute Amended
- 725 ILCS 5/109-1 - from Ch. 38, par. 109-1