+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (68)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1552
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date March 10, 2011
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 055-002-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 055-002-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Revenue; 006-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Revenue; 006-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Revenue
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Revenue
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr.
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - January 5, 2011
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-004-000
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr.
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Executive Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 11, 2011
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 28, 2010
- Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 8, 2010
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. John E. Bradley
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 30, 2010
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 042-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 15, 2010
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Forby
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2010
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 008-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Local Government
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Gary Forby
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2010
- Do Pass as Amended Local Government; 008-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government
- Postponed - Local Government
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Gary Forby
- Postponed - Local Government
- Held in Local Government
- Assigned to Local Government
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Gary Forby
+ − Adopted Amendments (4)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Tax Increment Allocation Redevelopment Act in the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that the redevelopment project in the TIF district created by an ordinance that was adopted on October 14, 1993 and extended on August 2, 2010 by the City of Venice must be completed by December 31 of the 35th year (now, the 23rd year) after the year in which the ordinance was adopted. Effective immediately.
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Tax Increment Allocation Redevelopment Act in the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that the redevelopment project in the TIF district created by an ordinance that was adopted on October 14, 1993 and extended on August 2, 2010 by the City of Venice must be completed by December 31 of the 35th year (now, the 23rd year) after the year in which the ordinance was adopted. Effective immediately.
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that the corporate authorities of a municipality located within a county with a population between 39,001 and 39,499, based on the 2000 federal decennial census, may, by an affirmative vote of the majority of its members, dissolve its police district. Provides that a municipality that dissolves a police district may reconstitute the police district by an affirmative vote of a majority of the members of the corporate authority. Effective immediately.
+ − Statute Amended
- 65 ILCS 5/7-4-7 - from Ch. 24, par. 7-4-7