+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On July 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0714
- Effective Date July 12, 2004
- Governor Approved
On June 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 4, 2004 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 118-000-000
On April 27, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 22, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Aging Committee; 009-000-000
On April 2, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Aging Committee
On March 26, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On March 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
On March 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2004
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Forby
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Health & Human Services; 010-000-000
On March 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Health & Human Services
On March 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Gary Forby
On February 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Gary Forby
On February 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 26, 2004
- Do Pass Health & Human Services; 007-000-000
On February 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Health & Human Services
On February 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Health & Human Services
On February 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Gary Forby
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
May 4, 2004: SB2530 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 04, 2004
March 25, 2004: SB2530 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 25, 2004
+ − Sponsors (57)
Type:
Primary Sponsor